August 22, 2018
Cincinnati Financial Corp. announced that Jacob F. Scherer Jr., chief insurance officer and executive vice president of its lead subsidiary, The Cincinnati Insurance Co., plans to retire in August 2019. The company also announced his replacement and other leadership changes …
July 27, 2018
Tokio Marine HCC announced that Susan Rivera has been appointed its next chief executive officer effective Sept. 1, 2018, replacing Christopher J.B. Williams, the current CEO. Williams is taking on a new role as managing executive officer and co-head of …
June 29, 2018
Lloyd’s of London today announced that Chief Executive Officer Inga Beale will step down next year after leading the global insurance and reinsurance market for five years. An exact departure date has not yet been set. Beale joined Lloyd’s in …
May 1, 2018
Scott M. Purviance has officially succeeded M. Steven DeCarlo as the chief executive officer at specialty wholesale broker AmWINS Group. The Charlotte-based brokerage also announced other that management changes have taken effect. AmWINS previewed Purviance’s elevation and the other management …
April 10, 2018
Insurance broker Beecher Carlson Insurance Services has promoted Joseph Siech to chief executive officer and B. Scott Davis to chief operating officer. Siech is responsible for planning and directing the execution of client services and growth initiatives as well as …
January 17, 2018
Charlotte-based global wholesale broker AmWINS Group announced that Scott M. Purviance will succeed M. Steven DeCarlo as the company’s chief executive officer, effective May 1, 2018. DeCarlo, who has served as CEO of AmWINS since joining in December 2000, will …
December 20, 2017
Starr Companies announced the appointment of Steve Blakey as president and chief executive officer of Starr Insurance Holdings. Blakey replaces Chuck Dangelo, who has announced his retirement. Dangelo has been with Starr since 2009, when he left American International Group …
October 11, 2017
The Hanover Insurance Group announced Tuesday that John C. Roche has been appointed president and chief executive officer, effective Nov. 4, succeeding Joseph M. Zubretsky. The news came about a half hour before Molina Healthcare announced that Zubretsky was stepping …
October 13, 2016
United States Aviation Underwriter Inc. (USAU), the manager of the United States Aircraft Insurance Group (USAIG), announced that David McKay, chairman and chief executive officer, plans to retire after nearly 40 years with the company. McKay’s retirement will be effective …
September 7, 2016
Insurance agency technology firm Vertafore announced that Amy Zupon will take over as chief executive officer effective October 3, succeeding Jeff Hawn who has been chairman and CEO since April 2015. Zupon joins Vertafore from P2 Energy Solutions where she …