August 9, 2005
The St. Paul Travelers Companies, Inc. has announced that Chief Financial Officer Jay S. Benet, 53, has been promoted to the position of vice chairman and CFO. The appointment is effective immediately. “Jay has earned an outstanding reputation throughout the …
July 29, 2005
The Independent Insurance Agents of San Antonio announced that the association’s August membership luncheon will feature Richard Kerr, CEO of Dallas-based MarketScout as the keynote speaker. The luncheon will be held Aug. 16 at the Oak Hills Country Club, 5403 …
July 28, 2005
Pinnacol Assurance, Colorado’s largest workers’ compensation insurer, announced that its board of directors has named Kenneth J. Ross as Pinnacol’s new president and CEO. Ross will succeed Gary Pon, who recently announced his retirement after 20 years as Pinnacol’s chief …
July 27, 2005
Warren Heck, chairman and chief executive officer of Greater New York Mutual Insurance Company in New York, N.Y., brought his company’s front line experience with terrorism risk before a House Financial Services subcommittee that is weighing the future of the …
July 19, 2005
Chicago-based Aon Corporation has appointed Andrew Appel, 40, as chief executive officer of Aon Consulting Worldwide, the company’s human capital and management consulting operation. The appointment is effective immediately. Appel will report to Greg Case, Aon’s president and CEO. Appel …
July 18, 2005
By Alan A. Smith, Jr. Many of our allies in the fight against the Garamendi Agenda were puzzled by IBA West General Counsel Steve Young’s open hostility toward the Western Insurance Agents Association’s “Line In The Sand” campaign on full …
July 15, 2005
Schaumburg, Ill.-based Zurich North America announced that Stephen Smith has retired as CEO of Universal Underwriters Group, a business unit of of the company’s commercial division. Universal Underwriters Group was recently sold to a group of investors led by Hellman …
July 7, 2005
In a separate announcement the ACE Tempest Re Group, the global reinsurance operations of the ACE Group of Companies, announced that James Wixtead has been appointed CEO of ACE Tempest Re USA, ACE’s Stamford, Connecticut-based reinsurance subsidiary. Wixtead succeeds Jacques …
July 5, 2005
American International Group Inc. has named Arthur Levitt as a special advisor to its board of directors and as a member of the board’s nominating and corporate governance Committee. Levitt’s duties will include advice with respect to potential nominees for …
July 4, 2005
The recently ousted chief executive of Mass Mutual Financial Group in Springfield abused his authority by retaliating against employees who questioned him and by using policyholders’ assets for personal ends, according to his termination letter. The termination letter accuses O’Connell …