April 1, 2005
A.M. Best Co. announced that it has affirmed various financial strength ratings of the P/C subsidiaries of GE Insurance Solutions Corp., including the financial strength ratings of ‘A’ (Excellent) of Employers Reinsurance Corporation (ERC) and Illinois-based GE Reinsurance Corporation (GE …
March 31, 2005
The National Safety Council will present its 2005 Green Cross for Safety Medallion to Liberty Mutual Group and its Chairman, President and CEO Edmund F. (Ted) Kelly at this evening. Established in 1999, The Green Cross for Safety award recognizes …
March 31, 2005
Aon Corporation on Thursday announced the appointment of Dave Hartoch as president and CEO of Swett & Crawford. Hartoch had previously headed the company from 1997 to 2003. Patrick Ryan, chairman and CEO of Aon Corp., said, “Dave is one …
March 29, 2005
The various investigations of giant insurer American International Group are continuing to take their toll. Maurice “Hank” Greenberg will step down as Chairman of American International Group’s Board of Directors later this week, ending his more than 40-year relationship with …
March 29, 2005
The Board of Directors of American International Group, Inc. (AIG) confirmed that it has received a letter from David Boies on behalf of its Chairman M. R. Greenberg, indicating his intent to retire from his position as chairman of the …
March 25, 2005
The U.K.’s Prudential, Britain’s second largest insurer, announced that Jonathan Bloomer, Group CEO for the last five years, will be replaced by Mark Tucker, currently group finance director at HBOS, the banking group formed by the merger of Halifax and …
March 24, 2005
A Chubb Insurance subsidiary that provided liability for the executives of Tyco International must pay the legal bills of that company’s former chief executive officer, L. Dennis Kozlowski, who is on trial charged with corporate fraud. The New York Supreme …
March 24, 2005
John J. Amore, chief executive officer general insurance of Zurich Financial Services Group, has been named the new chairman of the board of directors of the American Insurance Association. Michael S. McGavick, president and chief executive officer of Safeco Corporation, …
March 21, 2005
The Bermuda-based Arch Capital Group Ltd. announced that, in line with the succession plan that the company has in place, Robert Clements, founder and chairman of the company, will be stepping down as chairman and a director. He will continue …
March 21, 2005
The insurance industry is not particularly well known for its flamboyant personalities. So, when one does emerge, they make news. It’s not too surprising therefore to find Willis’ CEO Joe Plumeri as the subject of an in depth profile on …