December 19, 2003
Larry Forrester has been appointed as the president and CEO of the Insurance Education Foundation (IEF). Recently retired as president and CEO of the National Association of Mutual Insurance Companies (NAMIC), Forrester assumes leadership of the IEF immediately. He succeeds …
December 18, 2003
Minneapolis, Minn.-based workers’ compensation program manager RTW Inc. announced that its board of directors has elected Jeffrey B. Murphy, the company’s current chief financial officer to the position of president and CEO of RTW effective immediately. Murphy succeeds J. Alexander …
December 18, 2003
Robert J. Vaudreuil, president and CEO of The Protector Group Insurance Agency, Inc., one of New England’s largest independent insurance agencies, has been elected chairman of the board of The Massachusetts Association of Insurance Agents. The MAIA is the “leading …
December 16, 2003
Risk Enterprise Management Limited (REM), a provider of property and casualty third party administration (TPA) services, announced that Mike Riney, formerly president of REM’s TPA operations, has been appointed president and CEO of REM. This appointment follows the successful transition …
December 10, 2003
Fred Drexler, former chairman of Industrial Indemnity Company in San Francisco, died on Dec. 7. He was 88 years old. Drexler was a leader in the Western insurance industry. He was founder of the California Workers’ Compensation Institute in 1964, …
December 4, 2003
East Lansing, Mich.-based medical liability insurer American Physicians Capital Inc. announced today that William B. Cheeseman, its president and CEO, intends to retire from the company effective Dec. 31, 2003. “Bill was responsible for growing the company from its inception …
December 3, 2003
Platinum Equity LLC has named Dennis Replogle president and CEO of Broadspire, formerly Kemper Services. Replogle led a significant development effort at Specialty Risk Services, a subsidiary of the Hartford Financial Services Group. During Replogle’s eight years as president of …
December 2, 2003
Bengt Braun, who took over as the Chairman of Sweden’s Skandia earlier this year, has informed the board that he will resign effective immediately in the wake of a report that severely criticized several senior managers for improper dealings. Although …
December 1, 2003
Michael L. Browne, the non-executive chairman of the board of the Harleysville group, was elected to the National Association of Independent Insurers Board of Governors at its recent Annual Meeting in Atlanta, Georgia. The announcement indicated that, although board members …
November 20, 2003
Ohio-based ProCentury Corporation, the parent company of Century Insurance Group, announced that Edward Feighan has been named the company’s chairman and CEO. Feighan is an investor, entrepreneur and former Cuyahoga County Commissioner, Ohio House Representative, and United States Congressman. Feighan …