September 15, 2003
Alain Thibault, Chairman of the Board of Directors of Canada’s Property and Casualty Insurance Compensation Corporation (PACICC) announced that Paul Kovacs has been named PACICC’s next President and Chief Executive Officer, succeeding retiring CEO, Alex Kennedy, who will be leaving …
September 8, 2003
Aon Corp. announced that Clement Booth will be joining the company as CEO of Aon Re International, a unit of Aon Re Global, as of October 1, 2003. His appointment comes in conjunction with Aon’s announcement of the establishment of …
September 3, 2003
James Gardill has submitted his resignation as chairman and member of West Virginia’s WesBanco, Inc.’s Board of Directors, as well as a member of various subsidiary boards of WesBanco, effective Aug. 31, 2003, citing a decision by his law firm’s …
September 2, 2003
The Republic Group of Insurance Companies, of Dallas, is deeply saddened to report the death of the company’s president and chief executive officer, Bruce Robert Milligan. Mr. Milligan, who was 47 and had been thought to be in excellent health, …
August 27, 2003
Arch Insurance Group, a division of Bermuda-based Arch Capital Group Ltd., announced that Robert T. Van Gieson has been named to the position of President and CEO of Arch Capital UK Ltd., Arch’s London operation, beginning September 1. He will …
August 20, 2003
Allmerica Financial Corporation announced that it has named Frederick Eppinger, 44, President, Chief Executive Officer and Director, effective September 8. He will succeed John O’Brien, who resigned in the fall of 2002, as the decline in the equity markets hit …
August 19, 2003
Bob A. Borisoff, 75, past president, CEO and one of the founders of California-based Speare & Company Insurance Agents & Brokers, died Aug. 6. A native Californian, Borisoff had an extensive background in insurance, bonds and facultative reinsurance. He was …
August 13, 2003
Columbus, Ohio-based brokerage and risk-management firm Assurex Global announced the appointment of central Ohio’s James R. Hackbarth as CEO. Hackbarth takes the helm immediately. Hackbarth brings to Assurex Global extensive experience in all phases of management including business planning, acquisitions, …
August 5, 2003
Sax Riley, immediate past chairman of Lloyd’s, collapsed and died July 25 while playing golf in Surrey, England. He was 63. Riley retired from Lloyd’s last year under amicable circumstances, clearing the way for Lord Peter Levene to take over …
July 21, 2003
AXIS Capital Holdings Limited (“AXIS Capital”) announced the appointment of Dr. Karl Mayr as president and CEO of AXIS Re Europe (“AXIS Re”). Dr. Mayr will lead the AXIS Re underwriting team in developing and servicing our European reinsurance clients. …