January 19, 2024
Atain Names Dassow VP, Head of Primary Liability Atain Insurance Companies, headquartered in Farmington Hills, Mich., hired Tom Dassow as vice president and head of primary liability, leading Atain’s newly formed general liability brokerage unit. Most recently, Dassow led CM …
January 18, 2024
Valley Insurance Agency Alliance Promotes Kaatman to Director of Growth Valley Insurance Agency Alliance (VIAA), headquartered in St. Louis, Mo., promoted Bill Kaatman to director of growth. Kaatman brings 17 years of experience in the insurance industry, previously serving as …
January 17, 2024
Skyward Specialty Insurance Group, Inc., headquartered in Houston, Texas, made two new hires as it expands into the media liability market, focusing on multimedia, film and ad agencies. Regina Williams joins Skyward Specialty as vice president, media liability. Based in …
January 12, 2024
Allstate, headquartered in Northbrook, Ill., named Mike Fiato as executive vice president and chief claims officer, effective Jan. 22. Fiato joins Allstate with more than 32 years of industry experience. Most recently, he served as executive vice president and chief …
January 4, 2024
Church Mutual Insurance Company, headquartered in Merrill, Wis., promoted Alan S. Ogilvie from president to president and chief executive officer. Ogilvie assumed the role from Rich Poirier, who retired after 12 years at Church. Ogilvie previously held positions at Wausau …
January 3, 2024
Ryan Specialty Holdings, Inc., headquartered in Chicago, Ill., appointed Pat Ryan, Jr. to its board of directors following the retirement of William J. Devers. Ryan founded two high-growth software as a service (SaaS) companies and cofounded early-stage venture capital firm …
December 27, 2023
Leif Assurance, headquartered in St. Louis, Mo., recently hired Gabe Smith as a construction insurance specialist. Smith has 10 years of sales and insurance experience. Before joining Leif Assurance, he owned and served as an insurance agent at The Woodlands …
December 21, 2023
Leif Assurance Names Davis Creative Marketing Director Leif Assurance, headquartered in St. Louis, Mo., named Lauren Davis creative marketing director. Davis has worked as creative marketing director at Leif Assurance’s sister companies, Powers Insurance & Risk Management and Valley Insurance …
December 19, 2023
Aspen Insurance Holdings Limited, headquartered in Hamilton, Bermuda, appointed Michael Tate to the newly created role of inland marine – head of product & underwriting. Tate will be based in Chicago, Ill. Before Aspen, Tate served as chief underwriting officer …
December 14, 2023
Swift Joins XPT Specialty Brokerage Team XPT Specialty, headquartered in New York, N.Y., hired Ben Swift as an underwriter/broker specializing in commercial binding accounts for Midwest retailers. Before joining XPT, Swift served as a senior commercial underwriter at Chubb Insurance, …